Sam, Francis Bainyin (CPSO#: 28931)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga-Adangme-Krobo

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Francis Bainyin Sam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2013