Samaan, Muder Constantine (CPSO#: 86622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
McMaster University
Hsc-3A57
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75926
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. C & Z Samaan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Samaan ( CPSO# 87157 )
Dr. M. Samaan ( CPSO# 86622 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Mountain Health Services
Mood Disorders Program
P.O. Box 585 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muder Constantine Samaan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Endocrinology, McMaster University, in
                        which Dr. Samaan holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Samaan no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.