Samaan, Zainab Amer (CPSO#: 87157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. C & Z Samaan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Samaan ( CPSO# 86622 )
Dr. Z. Samaan ( CPSO# 87157 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Mountain Health Services
Mood Disorders Program
P.O. Box 585 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
           1.    Dr. Zainab Amer Samaan may practise medicine only,

                 (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                       Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, McMaster University, in
                       which Dr. Samaan holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                       Associate Professor, and
                 
                 (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                 
           2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Samaan no
                 longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.