Samadi, Nooshin (CPSO#: 83241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311-531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 235-5737
Fax: (905) 235-5738
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Samadi ( CPSO# 83241 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 235-5737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOOSHIN SAMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010