Samagh, Manjot Kaur (CPSO#: 77845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division - Emergency Dept
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 4164952550 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton ave w
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manjot Samagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Samagh ( CPSO# 77845 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division - Emergency Departmen
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANJOT KAUR SAMAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004