Samaha, Samar (CPSO#: 76246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All Med Health
Unit C1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMAR SAMAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2004