Samani, Amir Abbas (CPSO#: 85633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Department of General Pathology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Samani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samani ( CPSO# 85633 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Department of General Pathology
S3-453 - 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ABBAS SAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 24 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2007 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011