Samarasinghe, Dewanmina Arosha (CPSO#: 84514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-3951
Fax: (905) 336-9632
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

140, Centennial Rd
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 1H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 561-9255
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samarasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Samarasinghe ( CPSO# 84514 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-3951

Business Address:
2A - 140 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Phone Number: (905) 561-9255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEWANMINA AROSHA SAMARASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMARASINGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008