Samargandy, Lina Ahmed G (CPSO#: 98528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 28 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32615
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

268 Grosvenor St
St. Joseph's hospital
nuclear medicine department
London ON  N6C 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

339 WINDERMERE RD
UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
NUCLEAR MEDICINE DEPARTMENT
London ON  N6G 2J9
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA AHMED G SAMARGANDY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAMARGANDY is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SAMARGANDY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAMARGANDY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAMARGANDY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAMARGANDY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAMARGANDY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PEAP - Resident - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018