Samater, Habon (CPSO#: 100513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre for
Palliative Care
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HABON SAMATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMATER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2016