Sambasivan, Aarathi Susheela (CPSO#: 82724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6233
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Dust Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan ( CPSO# 82724 )
Dr. N. Dust ( CPSO# 84232 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sambasivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sambasivan ( CPSO# 82724 )
Dr. N. Dust ( CPSO# 84232 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARATHI SUSHEELA SAMBASIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMBASIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010