Sami, Pensee Anis (CPSO#: 52223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 ramsey lake road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7329 Ext. 2452
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fadel Ishak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017


Corporation Name: Pensee Sami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017


Corporation Name: Ishak and Sami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sami ( CPSO# 52223 )
Dr. F. Ishak ( CPSO# 50837 )

Business Address:
272 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 1M7
Phone Number: (705) 673-4415

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7329

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENSEE ANIS SAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1986