Samiee-Zafarghandy, Ehsan (CPSO#: 108055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Red Lake Medical Associates
51G Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Samiee-Zafarghandy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Samiee-Zafarghandy ( CPSO# 108055)

Business Address:
Red Lake Medical Associates
51G Highway 105
PO Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2751

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EHSAN SAMIEE-ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE-ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2017