Samis, Andrew James Willis (CPSO#: 68880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
c/o Dept of Surgery
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Samis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samis ( CPSO# 68880 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 540-7483

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 384-0174

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES WILLIS SAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000