Samman, Salsabila Ghassan H (CPSO#: 108778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALSABILA GHASSAN H SAMMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAMMAN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SAMMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAMMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAMMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAMMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAMMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2016 to 27 Jun 2016
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018