Samson, Benoit (CPSO#: 28748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2012