Samuel, George (CPSO#: 88075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015