Samuel, Maged Yousef Nasief (CPSO#: 81766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
809 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 681-1212
Fax: (905) 681-1216
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Burlington Walk-In Clinic
2025 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Canada
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Fax: (905) 333-1960
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Maple Villa LTC
441 Maple Avenue
Burlington ON  L7S 1L8
Canada
Phone: 905-639-2264
Fax: 905-639-3034
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Y. N. Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Samuel ( CPSO# 81766 )

Business Address:
202 - 809 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 681-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGED YOUSEF NASIEF SAMUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007