Samuels, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 72199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
Unit A2
150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: (905) 945-4772
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Heatlh Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Site
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 945-2253
Fax: (905) 945-0504
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital Site
711 Concession St.
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Samuels Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Samuels ( CPSO# 72199 )

Business Address:
Family Medical Centre
A2 - 150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 945-5424

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H1

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL SAMUELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMUELS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000