Samuelson Geraedts, Birgitta Anna Kristina (CPSO#: 57348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swedish

Education:University of Lund, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 1996