Samulska, Hanna Maria (CPSO#: 33704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2007