Samways, Michelle Lynn (CPSO#: 66605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
361 South Service Road
Grimsby ON  L3M 4E8
Phone: (905) 945-0060
Fax: (905) 945-9760
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNN SAMWAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMWAYS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997