San Miguel Arregui, Inigo (CPSO#: 99899)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Navarra, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2013 to 07 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 08 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 17 Feb 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Feb 2014