Sanad, Sanad Jassim Sanad Ahmed (CPSO#: 78303)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2003 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2004 to 25 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 25 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2007