Sanatani, Irina (CPSO#: 74906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Volokhov, Irina (used until: 04 Jul 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 204-6727
Fax: (519) 649-5055
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sanatani ( CPSO# 74703 )
Dr. I. Sanatani ( CPSO# 74906 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Oncology
L H S C - London Regional Cancer Program
Suite A3-915
790 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Business Address:
Suite 205
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 204-6727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRINA SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004