Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sanatani, Shubhayan (CPSO#: 66996)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2001