Sanchez, Angelita Rodriguez (CPSO#: 85670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8036
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelita Sanchez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sanchez ( CPSO# 85670 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELITA RODRIGUEZ SANCHEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009