Sanchez, Arturo (CPSO#: 19553)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 01 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 17 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 May 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2017
Summary:

On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Arturo Sanchez committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
suitability to practise. 
 
Dr. Sanchez was a paediatrician who had a practice in Toronto, Ontario. Dr. Sanchez is no longer 
a member of the College. He resigned his certificate of registration on November 16, 2015. 
 
On December 7, 2015, Dr. Sanchez was convicted of two counts of indecent assault with respect 
to Patient A and one count of indecent assault with respect to Patient F. The trial Judge’s 
findings with respect to Patients A and F include the following:  
 
Patient A  
 
The trial judge found that when Patient A was 14 and 15 years old, she was hospitalized in 
Toronto at the Hospital for Sick Children (“HSC”) in the 1960’s. The trial judge further found 
that during these admissions, Dr. Sanchez touched Patient A’s breasts and vagina for a sexual 
purpose. The trial judge found that one night during Patient A’s second hospital admission, Dr. 
Sanchez came in her room during the night, got on top of her and touched her breasts and vagina. 
This was done for his sexual gratification and not for any medical purpose. 
 
Patient F  
 
When Patient F was approximately 11 years old, she was prescribed weekly allergy shots. Dr. 
Sanchez would come to her home to give her these shots. The trial judge found that on one of 
these weekly visits, Dr. Sanchez gave Patient F a hug from the back and put his hands down the 
front of her shirt. On another occasion, Dr. Sanchez touched Patient F’s breast for a sexual 
purpose. 
 
On March 30, 2016 Dr. Sanchez was sentenced to 18 months incarceration. In imposing 
sentence, the trial Judge found that “the degree of responsibility attributable to the accused is at 
the high end of the scale – a deliberate breach of trust by a person of significant power and 
authority.” She found that aggravating factors included the victims’ were under 18 years of age, 
that the accused was in a position of trust, that the offences had considerable impact on the 
victims and that the assaults were persistent and lengthy, planned and deliberate and were not a 
spur of the moment thing. 
 
On May 1, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and 
costs that: 
-  The Registrar revoke Dr. Sanchez’s certificate of effective immediately. 
-  Dr. Sanchez attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Sanchez pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
   the date this Order becomes final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s)

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following are findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

ARTURO SANCHEZ was found guilty of the following on December 7, 2015:

1. Two counts of indecent assault against a female person, XX, in 1964 and 1965 contrary to section 149 of the Criminal Code;
2. One count of indecent assault against a female person, YY, in 1980 contrary to section 149 of the Criminal Code,

and was sentenced to 18 months on March 30, 2016.