Sanchez, Federico Jose (CPSO#: 68828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
2nd Floor
727 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4B3
Phone: (647) 295-5565
Fax: (647) 342-4100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Federico Sanchez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sanchez ( CPSO# 68828 )

Business Address:
3 - 727 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4B3
Phone Number: (647) 295-5565

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEDERICO JOSE SANCHEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 10 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998