Sanchez, Zenia (CPSO#: 60840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Cebu Doctors College of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
1300 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G8
Phone: (905) 279-5505
Fax: (905) 279-5557
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zenia Sanchez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Sanchez ( CPSO# 60840 )

Business Address:
110 - 1300 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G8
Phone Number: (905) 279-5505

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZENIA SANCHEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCHEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990