Sanders, Ari Paul (CPSO#: 108176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
76 Grenville Street, Room 5455
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 403-966-3125
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI PAUL SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2016 to 28 Aug 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017