Sanders, David Borden (CPSO#: 51565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General
Hospital
Suite 360
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-4290
Fax: (519) 245-4627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.B. Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sanders ( CPSO# 51565 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-4290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BORDEN SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1984