Sanders, Kenneth Cameron (CPSO#: 51566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sanders ( CPSO# 51566 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH CAMERON SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983