Sandha, Gurpal Singh (CPSO#: 68503)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University India, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2014