Sandhu, Harmanjit Singh (CPSO#: 79540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Chronic Headache and
Pain Management
Units 117 and 118
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 232-3055
Fax: (905) 232-6006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.S. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sandhu ( CPSO# 79540 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Chronic Headache and
Pain Management
Unit 117-118
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 232-3055

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMANJIT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005