Sandhu, Harminder Bobby Singh (CPSO#: 67810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care Belleville
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

kingston surgery centre
725 arlington park place
Kingston ON  K7M7E4
Canada
Phone: 6135461858
Fax: 6135464060
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harminder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sandhu ( CPSO# 67810 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care Belleville
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward County
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMINDER BOBBY SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2000