Sandhu, Mandeep Singh (CPSO#: 104551)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017