Sandhu, Manindar (CPSO#: 81137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King St East
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 3544
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Lung Care Clinic
1110 Sheppard Ave East
unit 204
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: 416-229-2315
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 864-6060 Ext. 3200
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2100 Ellesmere Rd
unit 326
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: 416-439-0130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sandhu ( CPSO# 81137 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 236
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2

Business Address:
117 King Street East
7th Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANINDAR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008