Sandhu, Roop Kaur (CPSO#: 82463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roop Kaur Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandhu ( CPSO# 82463 )

Business Address:
203 - 480 Huronia Road
Simcoe ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 727-7688

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROOP KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2009