Sandhu, Sharron Kaur (CPSO#: 85770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2013

Expiry Date:  12 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Rheumatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Annamalai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85770 )
Dr. G. Annamalai ( CPSO# 85750 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 13 Sep 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 19 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sharron Kaur Sandhu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Rheumatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Sandhu holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sandhu  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sandhu's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sandhu's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 13, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 12, 2020.