Sandino, Ximena Alexandra (CPSO#: 88613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De La Sabana, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1E2
Phone: (905) 634-1625
Fax: (905) 634-5332
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIMENA ALEXANDRA SANDINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDINO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2010 to 18 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011