Sandler, Sandra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 51718)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Names: Quartly, Sandra Elizabeth (used until: 28 Aug 1989 )     Quartly-Worswick, Sandra Elizabeth (used until: 11 Jun 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Master's Office, 6th Floor, 393 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1E6
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015