Sandokji, Abdulkareem Mohammad (CPSO#: 70767)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 06 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 06 Aug 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1998