Sandor, George Kalman (CPSO#: 56869)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 5, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 15, 2010, Mount Sinai Hospital notified the College that Dr. George Kalman Sandor's privileges were revoked, effective October 5, 2010.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011