Sandor, Pavel (CPSO#: 29688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Hungarian, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TS Neurodevelopmental Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
3 West Wing, Room 402
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5794
Fax: (416) 603-5182
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-4896 Ext. 2200
Fax: (416) 368-5025
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Sandor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandor ( CPSO# 29688 )

Business Address:
TS Neurodevelopmental Clinic
Toronto Western Hospital
3 West Wing, Room 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5794

Business Address:
229 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1N9
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAVEL SANDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1977