Sandor, Zsuzsanna Sarolta (CPSO#: 51569)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 13 Oct 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 05 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Oct 2015