Sandoz, Jacqueline Susanne (CPSO#: 84745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
The Rehabilitation Centre
1201-505 Smyth Road
CANVent Respiratory Services
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75318
Fax: 6137369054
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital General Camups
Division of Respirology
Division of Sleep Medicine
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73994
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Lung Health Program
2249 Carling Ave, Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Canada
Phone: 613-288-0163
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Blew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Blew ( CPSO# 72289 )
Dr. J. Sandoz ( CPSO# 84745 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SUSANNE SANDOZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDOZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012