Sands, Alex (CPSO#: 69361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: Grossman, Alexander (used until: 06 Mar 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8350
Fax: (416) 431-8164
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX SANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 26 Nov 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2007