Sanfilippo, Anthony John (CPSO#: 51571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony J. Sanfilippo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sanfilippo ( CPSO# 51571 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN SANFILIPPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANFILIPPO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1983