Sanford, Mark Neville (CPSO#: 31021)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 2006